MS HR46 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Corinth High School Warriors Cheer Team, Coaches Lesley Bain And Brittanie Brown, And Choreographer Johnny Taylor For Placing Second At The Mid-south Regional Competition 1-6a Large Game Day, Third At The Mississippi High School Activities Association State Championship Game Day Division, Second Place At The Deep South Rock N' Roll Classic, And Seventh Place In The Medium Non-tumbling Game Day Division At The Uca National High School Cheer Championships.
Title
Corinth High School Cheer Team; commend and congratulate upon outstanding season of competition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred To Rules |