MS HR37 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Mr. Willie Townsend Upon Earning His High School Equivalency Diploma.
Title
Mr. Willie Townsend; commend on earning his High School Equivalency Diploma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-27 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Rules |