MS HR30 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Davis Magnet International Baccalaureate Elementary School For Being Recognized As The Number One Elementary School In The State By Schooldigger.com.
Title
Davis Magnet International Baccalaureate Elementary School; commend on number one ranking received by SchoolDigger.com.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred To Rules |