MS HR28 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Booneville High School Cheerleading Team And Coach Sherry Ferrell For Winning The 2011 Mhsaa Class 3a Cheerleading Championship.
Title
Booneville High School Cheerleading Squad; commend & congratulate on winning MNSAA Class 3A State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-08 | Adopted | |
2012-02-03 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-02 | Referred To Rules |