MS HR23 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Miss Vivian O'neal, Miss Mississippi 2023, Upon Winning The Coveted Crown, And Expressing Best Wishes For Continued Success In All Her Future Endeavors.
Title
Miss Vivian O'Neal; commend upon winning Miss Mississippi 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred To Rules |