MS HR22 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Jones Junior College Bobcats Cheerleading Team And Coach Kayla Hankins For Winning First Place In The Open Coed Division Of The 2022 Uca College Championships.
Title
Jones Junior College Bobcats Cheerleading Team; commend on winning Open Coed Division - 2022 UCA College Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-01-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-01-24 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |