MS HR19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commemorating The Life And Legacy Of The Honorable Hiram Rhodes Revels On The Occasion Of The 150th Anniversary Of His Monumental 1870 Election To The United States Senate As The First African American To Serve In Congress And Acknowledging The Historical Legacy Of His Election And Accomplishments To The Great State Of Mississippi And The Entire Nation.
Title
Hiram Rhodes Revels; honor the occasion of the 150th anniversary of the election as the first African-American United States Senator.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred To Rules |