MS HR135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commemorating The Life And Legacy Of Mrs. Maggie Olegan Dunlap Allen, And Expressing Sincere And Deepest Sympathy To Her Family And Friends Upon Her Passing.
Title
Mrs. Maggie Olegan Dunlap Allen; commemorate life and express sympathy upon her passing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-30 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Referred To Rules |