MS HR131 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Members Of The Silver Bullet Club Of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi, For Its Impressive Contributions To The Youth Within Its Community.
Title
Silver Bullet club; commend for its many impressive community contributions in the Tallahatchie County community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred To Rules |