MS HR13 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Clinton, Madison County And Jackson Chapters Of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Along With The Jackson Association And Development Enterprise, Inc. (jade), On The Occasion Of Mississippi Delta Days At The Capitol In 2020, And Declaring February 4, 2020, As Mississippi Delta Day At The State Capitol.
Title
Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., recognize and declare Feb. 4, 2020, as Mississippi Delta Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-10 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-03-10 | House | Adopted |
2020-03-06 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred To Rules |