MS HR125 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Mourning The Loss And Honoring The Life And Legacy Of Reverend Dr. Donald Ellis Wildmon, Founder Of The American Family Association And Expressing Great Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Recent Passing.
Title
Reverend Dr. Donald Ellis Wildmon; commend life and legacy upon his passing as the founder of American Family Association.
Sponsors
Rep. Donnie Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred To Rules |