MS HR11 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Elder Walter S. Dixon, Sr., Upon The Occasion Of His 100th Birthday.
Title
Elder Walter S. Dixon, Sr.; commend upon the occasion of his 100th birthday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-04 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred To Rules |