MS HC99 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Esteemed And Laudable Legislative Career And Public Service Of The Most Honorable And Distinguished Gentleman From Harrison, The "ironman," "dean" And "godfather" Of The Mississippi Legislature, Senator Thomas Arlin "tommy" Gollott, Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement From The Mississippi Senate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senator Thomas A. "Tommy" Gollott; commend distinguished legislative career and public service upon the occasion of his retirement.

Sponsors

Rep. Jeffrey Guice [R]Rep. Jeramey Anderson [D]Rep. David Baria [D]Rep. Manly Barton [R]
Rep. Richard Bennett [R]Rep. Charles Busby [R]Rep. Timmy Ladner [R]Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R]
Rep. Scott DeLano [R]Rep. Casey Eure [R]Rep. Greg Haney [R]Rep. Randall Patterson [D]
Rep. John Read [R]Rep. Sonya Williams-Barnes [D]Rep. Patricia Willis [R]Rep. Henry Zuber [R]
Rep. Shane Aguirre [R]Rep. Otis Anthony [N]Rep. William Arnold [R]Rep. Willie Bailey [D]
Rep. Nick Bain [D]Rep. Mark Baker [R]Rep. Earle Banks [D]Rep. Shane Barnett [R]
Rep. Charles Beckett [R]Rep. Donnie Bell [D]Rep. Christopher Bell [D]Rep. Edward Blackmon [D]
Rep. Joel Bomgar [R]Rep. Scott Bounds [R]Rep. Randy Boyd [R]Rep. Chris Brown [R]
Rep. Clara Burnett [D]Rep. Larry Byrd [R]Rep. Credell Calhoun [D]Rep. Lester Carpenter [R]
Rep. Gary Chism [R]Rep. Bryant Clark [D]Rep. Alyce Clarke [D]Rep. Angela Cockerham [D]
Rep. John Corley [R]Rep. Dana Criswell [R]Rep. Ronnie Crudup [N]Rep. Becky Currie [R]
Rep. William Denny [R]Rep. Oscar Denton [D]Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D]Rep. Jarvis Dortch [D]
Rep. Dan Eubanks [R]Rep. Michael Evans [D]Rep. Bob Evans [D]Rep. John Faulkner [D]
Rep. Kevin Ford [R]Rep. Robert Foster [R]Rep. Karl Gibbs [D]Rep. Debra Gibbs [D]
Rep. Philip Gunn [R]Rep. Jeff Hale [R]Rep. Jeffery Harness [N]Rep. Ashley Henley [R]
Rep. John Hines [D]Rep. Stephen Holland [D]Rep. Gregory Holloway [D]Rep. Joey Hood [R]
Rep. Steve Hopkins [R]Rep. Kevin Horan [D]Rep. Stephen Horne [R]Rep. Mac Huddleston [R]
Rep. Abe Hudson [D]Rep. Jay Hughes [D]Rep. Lataisha Jackson [D]Rep. Chris Johnson [R]
Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Kabir Karriem [D]Rep. Bill Kinkade [R]Rep. John Lamar [R]
Rep. Vince Mangold [R]Rep. Steve Massengill [R]Rep. Missy Warren McGee [R]Rep. Doug McLeod [R]
Rep. Roun McNeal [R]Rep. Nolan Mettetal [R]Rep. Carl Mickens [D]Rep. Tom Miles [D]
Rep. Sam Mims [R]Rep. Ken Morgan [R]Rep. David Myers [D]Rep. Karl Oliver [R]
Rep. Solomon Osborne [N]Rep. Orlando Paden [D]Rep. Bill Pigott [R]Rep. Brent Powell [R]
Rep. Thomas Reynolds [D]Rep. Rob Roberson [R]Rep. Margaret Rogers [R]Rep. Ray Rogers [R]
Rep. Tracey Rosebud [D]Rep. Randal Rushing [R]Rep. Noah Sanford [R]Rep. Donnie Scoggin [R]
Rep. Omeria Scott [D]Rep. Fred Shanks [R]Rep. William Shirley [R]Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R]
Rep. Greg Snowden [R]Rep. Gary Staples [R]Rep. Jody Steverson [R]Rep. Rufus Straughter [D]
Rep. Preston Sullivan [D]Rep. Kathy Sykes [D]Rep. Cheikh Taylor [D]Rep. Mark Tullos [R]
Rep. Jerry Turner [R]Rep. Kenneth Walker [D]Rep. Price Wallace [R]Rep. Percy Watson [D]
Rep. Tom Weathersby [R]Rep. Jason White [R]Rep. Stacey Wilkes [R]Rep. Charles Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-27SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-27SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-27SenateAdopted
2019-03-26SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-22SenateReferred To Rules
2019-03-22HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-03-22HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-22HouseAdopted
2019-03-22HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-20HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback