MS HC96 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Life, Service And Legacy Of Mr. Alix H. Sanders, Sr., And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Alix H. Sanders, Sr.; commemorate life and service of upon his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-24 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-24 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred To Rules |