MS HC95 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Honoring The Esteemed Dr. Beverly Wade Hogan For Her Many Dedicated Years As President Of Tougaloo College And Congratulating Her Upon Her Retirement After 17 Years Of Distinguished And Meritorious Service.
Title
Dr. Beverly W. Hogan; commend for 17 years of service as president and congratulate upon her retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-21 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-21 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-21 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred To Rules |