MS HC95 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Acknowledging And Commending The Life Of Mrs. Ruby Jefferson Worsham And Congratulating Her Upon The Celebration Of Her 101st Birthday.
Title
Ruby Jefferson Worsham; commend and congratulate on her 101st birthday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-18 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-18 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-18 | Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-07 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-05 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-05 | Adopted | |
2011-03-04 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-04 | Referred To Rules |