MS HC93 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Dr. Andy Mullins, Longtime Education Adviser To The State Of Mississippi, On The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Dr. Andy Mullins; commend on retirement after lifelong career dedicated to improving education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2013-03-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred To Rules |