MS HC9 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Mrs. Mary Martin Childs Of The Peoples Bank Of Ripley Upon Being Named The 130th Chairman Of The Mississippi Bankers Association And The First Woman To Serve In The Role.
Title
Mary Childs; commend upon becoming 130th Chairman and first female chairman of the Mississippi Bankers Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2019-01-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred To Rules |