MS HC89 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Athleticism And Nfl Career Success Of Lemuel Joseph "lem" Barney And Recognizing Him As One Of The Legendary Football Players Of Jackson State University To Be Inducted Into The National Football League's Hall Of Fame.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lemuel Joseph "Lem" Barney; commend upon being a Jackson State university alumnus enshrined in the NFL Pro Football Hall of Fame.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-27SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-25SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-25SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-25SenateAdopted
2019-03-22SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-20SenateReferred To Rules
2019-03-20HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-03-20HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-20HouseAdopted
2019-03-19HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-14HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback