MS HC85 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Essie B. And William Earl Glenn Foundation For Better Living On The Occasion Of Hosting Its Second Community Focused Adverse Childhood Experiences Trauma Awareness Symposium And Declaring June 20, 2022, As Adverse Childhood Experiences (aces) Trauma Awareness Day.
Title
Adverse Childhood Experiences (ACEs) Trauma Awareness Day; recognize June 20, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred To Rules |