MS HC81 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Declaring April 12, 2018, As Remanufacturing (reman) Day.
Title
Remanufacturing (Reman) Day 2018; declare April 12 as.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-15 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred To Rules |