MS HC81 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Mr. Christopher L. Smith Upon Being Elected As The Imperial Potentate Of Shriners International And Shriners Hospitals For Children.
Title
Christopher L. Smith; acknowledge and commend service and leadership in Shriners International as Imperial Potentate.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] | Rep. Ken Morgan [R] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] | Rep. Nolan Mettetal [R] |
Rep. Patricia Willis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-08 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred To Rules |