MS HC8 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Mississippi State University Bulldogs Baseball Team For Winning The 2021 Ncaa Baseball National Championship.
Title
Mississippi State University Bulldogs Baseball Team; commend for winning the 2021 NCAA Baseball National Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-01-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-01-20 | House | Adopted |
2022-01-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred To Rules |