MS HC79 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Distinguished And Dedicated Career And Service Of Coach Lafayette Stribling And Congratulating Him Upon Being Inducted Into The Mississippi Sports Hall Of Fame Class Of 2018.
Title
Coach Lafayette Stribling; congratulate upon being inducted into the Mississippi Sports Hall of Fame Class of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred To Rules |