MS HC79 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Celebrating The Musical Accomplishments And The Homecoming Of Nationally Acclaimed Gospel Quartet, The Blackwood Brothers, Upon Their Performance For The Choctaw County Homecoming Concert At Ackerman Baptist Church On Saturday, March 29, 2014.
Title
Blackwood Brothers Quartet; commend musical accomplishments of in observance of Choctaw County Homecoming.
Sponsors
Rep. Joey Hood [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred To Rules |