MS HC76 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commemorating The Life, Legacy And Service Of Mr. Ben Richard Burney.
Title
Ben Richard Burney; commend life upon passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-04 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred To Rules |