MS HC75 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Joining Professional Football In Congratulating Former Jackson State University And National Football League Star Linebacker Robert Brazile Upon The Occasion Of His Induction Into The 2018 Class Of The Nfl Hall Of Fame.
Title
Robert Brazile; commend upon induction into NFL Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-15 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred To Rules |