MS HC72 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The State Of Mississippi's High Schools' Graduating Senior Classes Of 2020 Upon Their Academic Successes And Expressing The Greatest Hope For Success In Their Future Collegiate, Career, Athletic Or Military Endeavors.
Title
Class of 2020; commend and congratulate MS high school seniors upon graduation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-10 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-10 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-05-29 | House | Referred To Rules |