MS HC71 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Acknowledging International Women's Month And Designating The Month Of March 2022 As The Period Of Observation And Celebration Throughout The State Of Mississippi.
Title
International Women's Month; designate month of March 2022 as for statewide observance.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] | Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] | Rep. Hester Jackson-McCray [D] | Rep. Zakiya Summers [D] |
Rep. Shanda Yates [I] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred To Rules |