MS HC71 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Superintendent Dr. Ronnie Mcgehee Upon The Momentous Occasion Of His Retirement From The Madison County School District After 21 Years Of Dedicated Service.
Title
Dr. Ronnie McGehee; commend upon occasion of his retirement as superintendent from the Madison County School District.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Gunn [R] | Rep. Cory Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-01 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred To Rules |