MS HC71 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing February 20-26, 2011, As "national Food Check-out Week" To Celebrate The Abundance And Safety Of Food In Our Country.
Title
"National Food Check-Out Week"; designate February 20-26, 2011, as.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-22 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-22 | Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Referred To Rules |