MS HC70 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Service And Career Of Major Captain Brady Tonth, Jr., In Acknowledgment Of Becoming The First African-american Mississippian To Complete The United States Air Force Pilot Training School, And Recognizing Him As A Mississippi Living Legend In Observation Of African-american History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Major Captain Brady Tonth, Jr.; commend service and career and history of firsts as an African-American pilot in observance of African-American History Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-06SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-06SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-06SenateAdopted
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-05SenateReferred To Rules
2019-03-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-03-04HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-04HouseAdopted
2019-02-28HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-02-21HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback