MS HC7 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Stellar, Illustrious And Accomplished Musical And Teaching Career Of Mississippi's Native Son, Mr. T. Ray Lawrence, Of The Renowned New York Metropolitan Opera, And Extending To Him A Royal Welcome Back To His Native Birthplace Of Gulfport, Mississippi.
Title
T. Ray Lawrence; commend career as accomplished singer with the Metropolitan Opera upon his return to Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - House - House Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - House - House Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-01-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-01-14 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-01-14 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-14 | Adopted | |
2010-01-13 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-01-07 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-01-07 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-07 | Adopted | |
2010-01-06 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Rules |