MS HC69 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Life And Legacy Of Dr. Fitten Lamar Mcmillin, Jr., And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family, Friends And Community Upon His Passing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Fitten Lamar McMillin, Jr.; commend life and legacy upon his passing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-06SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-06SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-06SenateAdopted
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-05SenateReferred To Rules
2019-03-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-03-04HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-04HouseAdopted
2019-02-28HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-02-20HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback