MS HC68 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Life And Legacy Of Distinguished Service Rendered To This State And Nation By Vietnam War Veteran, Dr. Edwin "ed" J. Deuschle, Upon The Official Receipt Of Meritorious Service Medals For His Display Of Heroism In The Face Of Adversity In Commemoration Of The 50th Anniversary Of The Vietnam Battle That Forever Altered His Life On May 5, 1970.
Title
Dr. Edwin "Ed" J. Deuschle; commend upon formal receipt of meritorious service medals for heroism displayed during Vietnam War.
Sponsors
Rep. Donnie Bell [R] | Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2020-05-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-05-28 | House | Adopted |
2020-05-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-05-26 | House | Referred To Rules |