MS HC68 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Pearl High School Boys Pirates Soccer Team For Their Outstanding 2010-2011 Season And For Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 5a State Championship.
Title
Pearl Pirates Boy's Soccer Team; commend on winning Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-24 | Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-22 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-22 | Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-17 | Referred To Rules |