MS HC66 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating The Northwest Rankin High School Boys Soccer Team Upon Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 6a Boys Soccer State Championship.
Title
Northwest Rankin High School "Cougars" Boys Soccer Team; congratulate upon winning MHSAA Class 6A State Championships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred To Rules |