MS HC66 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Dr. Owen "bev" Evans Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement As The Chairman Of The Pediatrics Department At The University Of Mississippi Medical Center And For His Long Record Of Accomplishment In Providing Exceptional Care And Service To The Children Of Mississippi.
Title
Dr. Owen "Bev" Evans; commend upon retirement as Chairman of Pediatrics at UMMC and for record of service to children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-24 | Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-22 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-22 | Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Referred To Rules |