MS HC65 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Extend The 2020 Regular Session Of The Legislature For A Period Of Thirty Days From The Final Day Of The One Hundred Twenty-five Day Session To June 9, 2020; To Authorize The House And Senate To Adjourn For More Than Three Days; To Provide That The House And Senate Shall Reconvene On April 1, 2020, Unless The Speaker And Lieutenant Governor Jointly Determine That It Is Not Necessary To Reconvene; To Authorize The Speaker And Lieutenant Governor To Reconvene The House And Senate Before Or After April 1, 2020; To Extend The 2020 Regular Session Of The Legislature For Another Period Of Thirty Days To July 9, 2020, If The House And Senate Have Not Adjourned Sine Die On Or Before June 9, 2020; To Provide That If The Session Is Extended For A Second Period Of Thirty Days, The House And Senate Shall Reconvene On June 17, 2020, Unless The Speaker And Lieutenant Governor Jointly Determine That It Is Not Necessary To Reconvene; To Authorize The Speaker And Lieutenant Governor To Reconvene The House And Senate Before Or After June 17, 2020; To Amend Joint Rule 40 To Provide That When The Speaker And The Lieutenant Governor Have Jointly Set A Date And Time To Reconvene The Legislature As Provided In This Resolution, The Legislative Deadlines Shall Be Adjusted To Later Dates In Seven-day Periods Which Shall Be Counted In A Manner To Ensure That Each Of The Deadlines Occurs On The Same Day Of The Week As The Original Date For The Deadline; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Legislature; extend session, allow reconvening upon joint determination, and adjust deadlines to conform.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Gunn [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] | Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] | Rep. Missy Warren McGee [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 82 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 82 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred To Rules |