MS HC65 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Acknowledging And Commending The Exceptionally Diligent Service Mrs. Sharon Walker Rendered To The Ocean Springs School District Board Of Trustees.
Title
Mrs. Sharon Walker; commend exemplary service to the Ocean Springs School Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2013-02-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-02-26 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Rules |