MS HC64 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Honoring And Congratulating Esteemed Educator And Beloved Kindergarten Math Teacher Ms. Laura Bivins Of Ann Smith Elementary School In Madison County For Winning The United States Presidential Award For Excellence In Mathematics And Science Teaching, Which Is The Highest Award Of Its Kind From The United States Government.
Title
Laura Bivins; commend and congratulate upon winning the U.S. Presidential Award for Excellence in Mathematics and Science.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Gunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred To Rules |