MS HC64 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The 2019-2020 Pine Grove High School Lady Panthers Basketball Team Upon Winning The 2020 Mhsaa Class 1a State Basketball Championship And The Team's Fourth Consecutive Class 1a State Basketball Championship.
Title
Pine Grove High School Lady Panthers Basketball Team; commend on winning fourth consecutive Class 1A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2020-05-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-05-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred To Rules |