MS HC64 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Simpson Academy Football Team For Their Outstanding Season And For Finishing As Runner-up In The Mississippi Association Of Independent Schools (mais) Class 4a Division Ii State Championship.
Title
Simpson County Academy Football Team; commend on finishing as runner-up in the Class 4A Division II State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-02-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred To Rules |