MS HC64 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Bay Creek Baptist Church Upon The Occasion Of Its Historic Anniversary, Acknowledging The Celebration Of 118 Years Of Devout Faith And Spiritual Excellence.
Title
Bay Creek Baptist Church; commend historical legacy upon the occasion of its 118th anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-14 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred To Rules |