MS HC64 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Marie Elizabeth Wicks Of Ocean Springs, Mississippi, Upon Being Crowned Miss Mississippi Usa 2012.
Title
Marie Elizabeth Wicks; commend upon being crowned Miss Mississippi USA 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Tabled |
2013-03-27 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-02-26 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Zuber, Formby) |
2013-02-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-02-26 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Rules |