MS HC64 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Bay High School Steppers For Winning The Class 4a Grand State Championship.
Title
Bay High School Steppers; commend and congratulate on winning the overall Class 4A Grand State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-24 | Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-22 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-22 | Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Referred To Rules |