MS HC64 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Boy Scouts Of America And The Andrew Jackson Council On The 100th Anniversary Of Scouting On February 8, 2010.
Title
Andrew Jackson Council of the BSA; commend and congratulate on the 100th Anniversary of BSA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-25 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-25 | Adopted | |
2010-02-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-02-17 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-17 | Adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Rules |