MS HC62 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Electoral Success Of The Honorable Paul E. Winfield, Upon Being Elected The 44th Mayor Of The City Of Vicksburg, Mississippi.
Title
Honorable Paul E. Winfield; commend upon being elected the 44th Mayor of the City of Vicksburg.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-15 | Adopted | |
2010-02-10 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Rules |