MS HC60 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Simpson Academy Cougars Boys Basketball Team For Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 5a Boys Basketball State Championship.
Title
Simpson Academy Cougars Boys Basketball Team; commend for winning the MHSAA Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-09 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred To Rules |