MS HC60 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Simpson County Academy Lady Cougars Cross Country Team For Their Outstanding Season And For Winning The 2017 Mississippi Association Of Independent Schools (mais) Division Ii State Championship.
Title
Simpson County Academy Cross Country Team; commend on winning the MAIS Division II State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred To Rules |